EP0510801 - Operational amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.1997 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/44] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freitas, David Anthony 5915 Silver Leaf Road San Jose, California 95138 / US | 02 /
Khan, Roomy 1700 Halford No.124 Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | 03 /
Wang, Chorng Kuang 1158 Quail Creek Circle San Jose, California 95120 / US | [1992/44] | Representative(s) | Killgren, Neil Arthur IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/44] | Killgren, Neil Arthur IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 92302299.0 | 18.03.1992 | [1992/44] | Priority number, date | US19910676904 | 27.03.1991 Original published format: US 676904 | [1992/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0510801 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0510801 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/45 | [1992/44] | CPC: |
H03F3/45192 (EP,US);
H03F3/45654 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45008 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45082 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45402 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45574 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/44] | Title | German: | Operationsverstärker | [1992/44] | English: | Operational amplifier | [1992/44] | French: | Amplificateur opérationnel | [1992/44] | Examination procedure | 20.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 29.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/13] | 30.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/13] | 10.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1996 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0398065 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]); | [XP]GB2242326 (SILICON SYSTEMS INC [US]) | [Y] - IEEE 1987 SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS CONFERENCE, vol. 30, 1st edition, February 1987, pages 44-45,333-334, New York, US; M. ARMSTRONG et al.: "A CMOS programmable self-calibrating 13b, eight-channel analog interface processor" | [Y] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, vol. 24, no. 6, December 1989, pages 1507-1516, New York, US; M. NAYEBI et al.: "A 10-bit video BiCMOS track-and-hold amplifier" | [A] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, vol. 25, no. 6, December 1990, pages 1575-1585, New York, US; R. CASTELLO et al.: "Analog front end of an ECBM transceiver for ISDN" | [A] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, vol. SC-22, no. 2, April 1987, pages 287-294, New York, US; E. SÄCKINGER et al.: "A versatile building block: The CMOS differential difference amplifier" |