EP0516267 - High-aluminium-containing ferritic stainless steel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSHIN STEEL CO., LTD. 4-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | For all designated states NISSHIN STEEL CO., LTD. 4-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uematsu, Yoshihiro, c/o Tekkou Kenkyusho Nisshin Steel Co., Ltd., 4976 Nomura Minamimachi Shinnanyou-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 02 /
Miyakusu, Katsuhisa, c/o Tekkou Kenkyusho Nisshin Steel Co., Ltd., 4976 Nomura Minamimachi Shinnanyou-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 03 /
Hiramatsu, Naoto, c/o Tekkou Kenkyusho Nisshin Steel Co., Ltd., 4976 Nomura Minamimachi Shinnanyou-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | [1992/49] | Representative(s) | March, Gary Clifford Batchellor, Kirk & Co. 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | March, Gary Clifford Batchellor, Kirk & Co. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London EC1R 0DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 92302329.5 | 18.03.1992 | [1992/49] | Priority number, date | JP19910154085 | 29.05.1991 Original published format: JP 15408591 | [1992/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0516267 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0516267 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/22, F01N3/28 | [1992/49] | CPC: |
B01D53/945 (EP,US);
C22C38/22 (EP,KR,US);
F01N3/2807 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/49] | Title | German: | Ferritischer, rostfreier Stahl mit hohem Aluminiumgehalt | [1992/49] | English: | High-aluminium-containing ferritic stainless steel | [1992/49] | French: | Acier inoxydable ferritique à teneur élevée en aluminium | [1992/49] | Examination procedure | 23.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/25] | 23.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.06.1997 | SE | 11.09.1997 | [2008/02] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 11.06.1997 | |
SE | 11.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | SE | 11.09.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE734854 (HERAEUS VACUUMSCHMELZE AG); | [A]DE763358 (HERAEUS VACUUMSCHMELZE AG); | [X]GB833446 (KANTHAL AB); | [X]SU552369 |