07.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] |
28.12.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] |
03.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] |
17.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] |
03.09.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
27.03.1998 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.05.1998 [1998/20] |
20.02.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] |
30.01.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.1998 [1998/12] |
16.01.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] |
28.11.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.01.1998 [1998/03] |
21.11.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] |
04.04.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.05.1997 [1997/21] |
04.04.1997 |
Change - miscellaneous |
|
04.04.1997 |
Change - miscellaneous |
published on 21.05.1997 [1997/21] |
27.03.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.01.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.10.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.10.1996 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 04.12.1996 [1996/49] |
05.04.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
29.03.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.07.1994 |
First examination report |
|
05.01.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.02.1994 [1994/08] |
23.06.1993 |
Publication of search report |
published on 11.08.1993 [1993/32] |
11.09.1992 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.10.1992 [1992/44] |