Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2801806B | Global Dossier | 21.09.1998 | B2 | JPH0578102 | 30.03.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | JP27046791 | 24.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2555505B | Global Dossier | 20.11.1996 | B2 | JPH0597435 | 20.04.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | JP7299492 | 26.02.1992 | JP8328591 | 22.03.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0760354 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2001 | B1 | EP0760354 | 09.07.1997 | A3 | EP0760354 | 05.03.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP7299492 | 26.02.1992 | JP27046791 | 24.09.1991 | JP8328591 | 22.03.1991 | EP92302400 | 19.03.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5512538 | 30.04.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US85440192 | 19.03.1992 | JP7299492 | 26.02.1992 | JP27046791 | 24.09.1991 | JP8328591 | 22.03.1991 | US4761893 | 16.04.1993 | US26631994 | 27.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5583093 | 10.12.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US85440192 | 19.03.1992 | JP7299492 | 26.02.1992 | JP27046791 | 24.09.1991 | JP8328591 | 22.03.1991 | US4761893 | 16.04.1993 | US47336295 | 07.06.1995 | US26631994 | 27.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0510806 | Global Dossier | 21.05.1997 | B1 | EP0510806 | 11.08.1993 | A3 | EP0510806 | 28.10.1992 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP7299492 | 26.02.1992 | JP27046791 | 24.09.1991 | JP8328591 | 22.03.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE153322T | 15.06.1997 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP7299492 | 26.02.1992 | JP27046791 | 24.09.1991 | JP8328591 | 22.03.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE205172T | 15.09.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP7299492 | 26.02.1992 | JP27046791 | 24.09.1991 | JP8328591 | 22.03.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69219817T | 16.10.1997 | T2 | DE69219817D1 | 26.06.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP7299492 | 26.02.1992 | JP27046791 | 24.09.1991 | JP8328591 | 22.03.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69232051T | 13.06.2002 | T2 | DE69232051D1 | 11.10.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP7299492 | 26.02.1992 | JP27046791 | 24.09.1991 | JP8328591 | 22.03.1991 | Type | Divisional application | EP0760354 |