EP0506324 - Mixing arm assembly for automatic capsule mixing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.1997 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.02.1998 [1998/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KERR MANUFACTURING COMPANY 28200 Wick Road, Box 455 Romulus Michigan 48174 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states KERR MANUFACTURING COMPANY 28200 Wick Road, Box 455 Romulus, Michigan 48174 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steele, Charles Edward 6032 Porteridge Lane Canton, Michigan 48187 / US | [1992/40] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Eastcheap House Central Approach Letchworth, Hertfordshire SG6 3DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 92302492.1 | 23.03.1992 | [1992/40] | Priority number, date | US19910691496 | 25.03.1991 Original published format: US 691496 | [1992/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0506324 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0506324 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61C5/06 | [1992/40] | CPC: |
A61C5/68 (EP,US);
B01F31/24 (EP,US);
B01F31/201 (EP,US);
B01F35/422 (EP,US);
Y10S366/602 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1992/40] | Title | German: | Mischungsarm-Aufbau für automatische Kapsel-Mischvorrichtung | [1992/40] | English: | Mixing arm assembly for automatic capsule mixing device | [1992/40] | French: | Ensemble de bras de mixage pour dispositif mélangeur automatique pour cartouches | [1992/40] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/44] | 25.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/06] | 11.09.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1998/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3815115 (INQUE K) [X] 1,3,4,9 * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 52; figures 1,4,6,7 *; | [X]US1490214 (JOHNSON ALVIN L) [X] 1,3-7,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US3583647 (PATERSON WERNER A) [A] 1,3,4,7-10 * column 2, line 55 - column 4, line 18; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3411755 (STRAUSS WALTER S, et al) [A] 1,7,9,10 * figures 1,3; claim 9 * |