EP0507563 - Still image selection and output apparatus having fast access [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/41] | Still image signal output apparatus | ||
[1997/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1998 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.06.1998 [1998/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/41] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seki, Yosuke, c/o Patents Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Matsumoto, Akihiko, c/o Patents Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1992/41] | Representative(s) | Pilch, Adam John Michael, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/41] | Pilch, Adam John Michael, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92302859.1 | 01.04.1992 | [1992/41] | Priority number, date | JP19910069966 | 02.04.1991 Original published format: JP 6996691 | JP19910071845 | 04.04.1991 Original published format: JP 7184591 | [1992/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0507563 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0507563 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0507563 | Date: | 18.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/21, H04N1/00 | [1992/41] | CPC: |
G11B27/002 (EP,US);
H04N5/907 (KR);
H04N1/00283 (EP,US);
H04N1/2179 (EP,US);
H04N5/765 (KR);
H04N5/937 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/41] | Title | German: | Standbildauswahl- und ausgabegerät mit schnellem Zugriff | [1997/25] | English: | Still image selection and output apparatus having fast access | [1997/25] | French: | Dispositif de sélection et de sortie d'images fixes à accès rapide | [1997/25] |
Former [1992/41] | Stehbildsignalausgabegerät | ||
Former [1992/41] | Still image signal output apparatus | ||
Former [1992/41] | Dispositif de sortie de signaux d'images fines | Examination procedure | 27.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/30] | 22.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2095949 (EECO INC); | [A]EP0258976 (UNIV ARIZONA FOUNDATION [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 436 (P-938)29 September 1989 |