EP0508683 - Bearing assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/42] | Bearing construction and vibration detecting apparatus | ||
[1995/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.1996 [1996/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSHI SEIKI KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 260, Taji-i, Mihara-cho Minamikawachi-gun Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/42] | For all designated states DENSHI SEIKI KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 260, Taji-i, Mihara-cho Minamikawachi-gun, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okumura, Hiromitsu 241-2, Mihara-cho-kuroyama Minamikawachi-gun, Osaka / JP | [1992/42] | Representative(s) | Hillier, Peter Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/42] | Hillier, Peter Reginald W. Barker & Co., Chancery House, 53-64, Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 92302918.5 | 02.04.1992 | [1992/42] | Priority number, date | JP19910106683 | 10.04.1991 Original published format: JP 10668391 | [1992/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0508683 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0508683 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16C32/06, G01M13/04 | [1992/42] | CPC: |
G01M1/24 (EP,US);
F16C32/0614 (EP,US);
G01H1/003 (EP,US);
G01M1/04 (EP,US);
F16C32/0648 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/42] | Title | German: | Lagereinrichtung | [1995/49] | English: | Bearing assembly | [1995/49] | French: | Assemblage de palier | [1995/49] |
Former [1992/42] | Lagerkonstruktion und Vibrationsanzeigemechanismus | ||
Former [1992/42] | Bearing construction and vibration detecting apparatus | ||
Former [1992/42] | Construction de palier et dispositif pour détecter des vibrations | Examination procedure | 25.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/21] | 06.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4193644 (KANAI AKIRA [JP], et al); | [A]US4333355 (DACUS MICHAEL W, et al); | [A]EP0275792 (MECANIQUE MAGNETIQUE SA [FR]); | [A]EP0275791 (MECANIQUE MAGNETIQUE SA [FR]) |