EP0509726 - Image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/43] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inomata, Mitsugu, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/43] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/43] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92303250.2 | 10.04.1992 | [1992/43] | Priority number, date | JP19910108346 | 15.04.1991 Original published format: JP 10834691 | JP19910133352 | 10.05.1991 Original published format: JP 13335291 | JP19920082194 | 03.04.1992 Original published format: JP 8219492 | [1992/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0509726 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0509726 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0509726 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/01, G03G15/08, G03G15/09 | [1992/43] | CPC: |
G03G15/0896 (EP,US);
G03G15/0126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/43] | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsgerät | [1992/43] | English: | Image forming apparatus | [1992/43] | French: | Appareil de formation d'images | [1992/43] | Examination procedure | 18.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/02] | 28.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 25.09.1996 | IT | 25.09.1996 | DE | 28.12.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 25.09.1996 | |
DE | 28.12.1996 | ||
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/34] | DE | 28.12.1996 | |
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/29] | DE | 28.12.1996 | |
Former [N/P] | deleted | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP64000971 ; | [A]JP62121473 ; | [A]EP0326941 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]); | [A]EP0410730 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]); | [A]EP0411825 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]); | [A]US4996566 (MORITA SHIZUO [JP], et al); | [AP]EP0473182 (CANON KK [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 162 (P-859)(3510) 19 April 1989 & JP-A-64 000 971 ( RICOH ) 5 January 1989, & JP64000971 A 19890105 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 337 (P-633)(2784) 5 November 1987 & JP-A-62 121 473 ( KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND. ) 2 June 1987, & JP62121473 A 19870602 |