EP0509807 - Processing chemical kit for light-sensitive silver halide photographic material and method for its dissolution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.1997 [1997/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/43] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishi-shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuse, Satoru, Konica Corporation 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Koboshi, Shigeharu, Konica Corporation 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1992/43] | Representative(s) | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/43] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 92303419.3 | 15.04.1992 | [1992/43] | Priority number, date | JP19910122602 | 24.04.1991 Original published format: JP 12260291 | JP19910109758 | 15.04.1991 Original published format: JP 10975891 | [1992/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0509807 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G03C5/26 | [1992/43] | CPC: |
G03C5/267 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/43] | Title | German: | Satz von Verarbeitungschemikalien für photographisches, lichtempfindliches Silberhalogenidmaterial und Verfahren zum Auflösen | [1992/43] | English: | Processing chemical kit for light-sensitive silver halide photographic material and method for its dissolution | [1992/43] | French: | Kit de produits chimiques pour le traitement d'un matériau photographique à l'halogénure d'agent et procédé pour sa dissolution | [1992/43] | Examination procedure | 02.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/22] | 19.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/22] | 03.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0469877 ; | [XD]EP0358034 ; | [Y]GB2112954 ; | [Y]GB2195783 ; | [Y]US2196901 ; | [Y]FR2286415 ; | [A]FR930369 ; | [AD]US4973416 | [Y] - GB-A- AD.19096 652 (T.O.KENT AND OPPENHEIMER,SON ,AND COMPANY LIMITED) |