EP0509838 - Vibration damping of gas turbine engine buckets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/43] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bobo, Melvin 5629 Oak Vista Drive Cincinnati, Ohio 45227 / US | [1992/43] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [2008/42] |
Former [1992/43] | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92303489.6 | 16.04.1992 | [1992/43] | Priority number, date | US19910687646 | 19.04.1991 Original published format: US 687646 | [1992/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0509838 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/26 | [1992/43] | CPC: |
F01D5/22 (EP,US);
Y10S416/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/43] | Title | German: | Vibrationsdämpfung von Gasturbinenschaufeln | [1992/43] | English: | Vibration damping of gas turbine engine buckets | [1992/43] | French: | Amortissement des vibrations des aubes de turbines à gaz | [1992/43] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/24] | 14.10.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2095702 ; | [AD]US4111603 (STAHL WILLIAM F); | [A]US4183720 (BRANTLEY JAMES W [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 295 (M-990)(4238) 26 June 1990 & JP-A-2 095 702 ( HITACHI ) 6 April 1990, & JP2095702 A 19900406 |