EP0511025 - Improvements in and relating to the manufacture of non-woven fabrics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.1999 [1999/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON FILCON CO., LTD. No. 27-24, Ikejiri 3-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 154 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/44] | For all designated states NIPPON FILCON CO., LTD. No. 27-24, Ikejiri 3-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 154 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kitamura, Ichihiro, c/o Nippon Filcon Co., Ltd. 2220, Ohmari Inagi-Shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nakajima, Tatsutoshi, c/o Nippon Filcon Co., Ltd. 2220, Ohmari Inagi-Shi, Tokyo / JP | [1992/44] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/44] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 92303777.4 | 27.04.1992 | [1992/44] | Priority number, date | JP19910188371 | 26.04.1991 Original published format: JP 18837191 | [1992/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0511025 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0511025 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/00, B29C43/48, B29C67/00, B65G15/42 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
D04H1/495 (EP,US);
B29C43/48 (EP,US);
B29C70/502 (EP,US);
B65G15/42 (EP,US);
D04H18/04 (EP,US);
B65G2201/02 (EP,US);
B65G2207/04 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1992/44] | D04H1/00, B29C43/48, B29C67/14, B65G15/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1992/44] | Title | German: | Verbesserungen in Zusammenhang mit der Vliesstoffherstellung | [1992/44] | English: | Improvements in and relating to the manufacture of non-woven fabrics | [1992/44] | French: | Améliorations rapportant à la fabrication d'étoffes non-tissés | [1992/44] | Examination procedure | 23.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/25] | 28.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1995 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.1995 | 01.05.1996 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3274018 (RUSSELL GORDON D, et al); | [X]FR2276914 (KROYER ST ANNES LTD KARL [GB]); | [A]WO8805838 (ALLIED CORP [US]); | [A]US4840829 (SUZUKI MIGAKU [JP], et al); | [A]EP0344365 (BORGERS JOHANN GMBH CO KG [DE]); | [X]US4995151 (SIEGEL JODIE M [US], et al) |