EP0512728 - Smooth upshift control method/system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.1997 [1997/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/46] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boardman, Mark David 3091 Rolling Hills Portage, Michigan 49003 / US | [1992/46] | Representative(s) | Douglas, John Andrew Eaton House Staines Road Hounslow Middlesex TW4 5DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/46] | Douglas, John Andrew Eaton House Staines Road Hounslow Middlesex TW4 5DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 92303785.7 | 27.04.1992 | [1992/46] | Priority number, date | US19910698752 | 09.05.1991 Original published format: US 698752 | [1992/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0512728 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0512728 | Date: | 21.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0512728 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60K41/08, B60K41/28 | [1993/30] | CPC: |
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
F16H61/04 (KR);
B60W10/111 (EP,US);
B60W30/18 (EP,US);
B60W2510/0652 (EP,US);
F16H61/0437 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1992/46] | B60K41/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/46] | Title | German: | Steuerungssystem/Verfahren zum weichen Hochschalten | [1992/46] | English: | Smooth upshift control method/system | [1992/46] | French: | Méthode/système de commande pour monter les vitesses sans à coup | [1992/46] | Examination procedure | 26.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 21.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0129417 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]EP0228544 (EATON CORP [US]); | [AD]EP0178110 (EATON CORP [US]); | [A]EP0244131 (EATON CORP [US]); | [A]EP0390357 (EATON CORP [US]); | [A]US4744031 (TAKEDA HITOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0308072 (EATON CORP [US]) |