EP0516289 - Computer system and method of operating the computer system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bealkowski, Richard 1401 Hummingbird Drive Delray Beach, Florida 33444 / US | 02 /
Blackledge, John Wiley Jr. 304 Sequoia Lane Boca Raton, Florida 33487 / US | 03 /
Gulley, Jackie Wayland 4426 Brandon Drive Delray Beach, Florida 33445-2233 / US | [1992/49] | Representative(s) | Blakemore, Frederick Norman IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | Blakemore, Frederick Norman IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 92303901.0 | 30.04.1992 | [1992/49] | Priority number, date | US19910706491 | 28.05.1991 Original published format: US 706491 | [1992/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0516289 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0516289 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/023 | [1992/49] | CPC: |
G06F3/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/49] | Title | German: | Rechnersystem und Verfahren zum Betrieb des Rechnersystems | [1992/49] | English: | Computer system and method of operating the computer system | [1992/49] | French: | Système d'ordinateur et méthode de fonctionnement du système d'ordinateur | [1992/49] | Examination procedure | 31.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/21] | 30.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/19] | 08.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1997 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0309994 | [A] - PC TECH JOURNAL vol. 5, no. 7, July 1987, pages 134 - 156 B. SMITH 'Keying on a Standard' |