EP0518475 - Analysis of samples utilizing capillary electrophoresis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.1998 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS, INC. 2500 Harbor Boulevard Box 3100 Fullerton California 92634-3100 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | For all designated states BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS, INC. 2500 Harbor Boulevard Box 3100 Fullerton California 92634-3100 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Fu-Tai Albert 105 S. Cristal Springs Brea, California 92621 / US | 02 /
Sternberg, James C. 201 Catalina Road Fullerton, California 92635 / US | [1992/51] | Representative(s) | Ede, Eric Fitzpatricks 1 Blythswood Square Glasgow G2 4AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | Ede, Eric Fitzpatricks, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 92303985.3 | 01.05.1992 | [1992/51] | Priority number, date | US19910708272 | 31.05.1991 Original published format: US 708272 | [1992/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0518475 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0518475 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/26, G01N33/68, G01N33/50, // G01N33/66 | [1992/51] | CPC: |
G01N27/44747 (EP,US);
G01N33/66 (EP,US);
G01N33/68 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/51] | Title | German: | Musteranalyse durch kapillare Elektrophorese | [1992/51] | English: | Analysis of samples utilizing capillary electrophoresis | [1992/51] | French: | Analyse d'échantillons par électrophorèse capillaire | [1992/51] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/29] | 29.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.04.1997 | CH | 09.04.1997 | DK | 09.04.1997 | LI | 09.04.1997 | NL | 09.04.1997 | LU | 01.05.1997 | SE | 09.07.1997 | [2004/38] |
Former [2000/52] | AT | 09.04.1997 | |
CH | 09.04.1997 | ||
DK | 09.04.1997 | ||
LI | 09.04.1997 | ||
NL | 09.04.1997 | ||
LU | 31.05.1997 | ||
SE | 09.07.1997 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 09.04.1997 | |
DK | 09.04.1997 | ||
NL | 09.04.1997 | ||
LU | 31.05.1997 | ||
SE | 09.07.1997 | ||
CH | 14.07.1997 | ||
LI | 14.07.1997 | ||
Former [2000/07] | AT | 09.04.1997 | |
DK | 09.04.1997 | ||
NL | 09.04.1997 | ||
LU | 31.05.1997 | ||
SE | 09.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 09.04.1997 | |
DK | 09.04.1997 | ||
NL | 09.04.1997 | ||
SE | 09.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | AT | 09.04.1997 | |
NL | 09.04.1997 | ||
SE | 09.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | AT | 09.04.1997 | |
NL | 09.04.1997 | ||
Former [1998/02] | AT | 09.04.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY vol. 516, 1990, AMSTERDAM NL pages 89 - 98 D.JOSIC ET AL. 'High-performance capillary electrophoresis of hydrophobic membrane proteins' | [Y] - JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY. vol. 255, no. 10, 25 May 1980, BALTIMORE US pages 4876 - 4884 S.NARASIMHAN ET AL. 'Control of glycoprotein synthesis' | [Y] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA. vol. 88, March 1991, WASHINGTON US pages 2302 - 2306 J.LIU ET AL. 'Ultrasensitive fluorometric detection of carbohydrates as derivatives in mixtures separated by capillary electrophoresis' | [A] - CLINICAL CHEMISTRY. vol. 37, no. 1, January 1991, WINSTON US pages 14 - 19 FU-TAI A. CHEN ET AL. 'Capillary electrophoresis: a new clinical tool' | [XP] - JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY vol. 559, no. 1-2, 18 October 1991, AMSTERDAM NL pages 445 - 453 FU-TAI A. CHEN 'Rapid protein analysis by capillary electrophoresis' | [T] - ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY vol. 205, 15 August 1992, NEW YORK US pages 115 - 124 J.P.LANDERS ET AL 'High-performance capillary electrophoresis of gly |