30.07.2004 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] |
10.11.2000 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
27.10.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] |
30.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2000 [2000/07] |
20.02.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] |
13.02.1998 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.04.1998 [1998/14] |
30.01.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.1998 [1998/12] |
28.11.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.01.1998 [1998/03] |
21.11.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] |
21.02.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.04.1997 [1997/15] |
16.01.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.10.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.08.1996 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
23.08.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.05.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
14.05.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.05.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.02.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.12.1994 |
First examination report |
|
02.06.1993 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.07.1993 [1993/29] |
30.10.1992 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.12.1992 [1992/51] |