Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0760147B | Global Dossier | 28.06.1995 | B2 | JPH05322846 | 07.12.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US70827291 | 31.05.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU662138B | Global Dossier | 24.08.1995 | B2 | AU1628792 | 03.12.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US70827291 | 31.05.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0518475 | Global Dossier | 09.04.1997 | B1 | EP0518475 | 16.12.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70827291 | 31.05.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE151533T | 15.04.1997 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US70827291 | 31.05.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2069053 | 18.05.1999 | C | CA2069053 | 01.12.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70827291 | 31.05.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69218832T | 17.07.1997 | T2 | DE69218832D1 | 15.05.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US70827291 | 31.05.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2100285T | 16.06.1997 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US70827291 | 31.05.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5120413 | 09.06.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US70827291 | 31.05.1991 |