blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0512777

EP0512777 - Purification of propylene oxide by liquid extraction [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.09.1995
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.1995No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.10.1995 [1995/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TEXACO CHEMICAL COMPANY
3040 Post Oak Boulevard Houston
Texas 77056 / US
[N/P]
Former [1992/46]For all designated states
TEXACO CHEMICAL COMPANY
3040 Post Oak Boulevard
Houston, Texas 77056 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Smith, William Alan
7910 Petaca
Austin, Texas 78759 / US
02 / Meyer, Robert Allen
13940 Reflection Drive, Apt. 113
Ballwin, MO 63021 / US
03 / Nguyen, Eileen Tovan
3731 Vineyard
Houston, Texas 77082 / US
[1992/46]
Representative(s)Green, Mark Charles, et al
Murgitroyd & Company London
Euston House
24 Eversholt Street
London NW1 1AD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/46]Green, Mark Charles, et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 91 Wimpole Street
London W1M 8AH / GB
Application number, filing date92304000.001.05.1992
[1992/46]
Priority number, dateUS1991069738509.05.1991         Original published format: US 697385
[1992/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0512777
Date:11.11.1992
Language:EN
[1992/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0512777
Date:02.11.1994
Language:EN
[1994/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.08.1992
ClassificationIPC:C07D301/32, C07D301/19, C07D303/04
[1992/46]
CPC:
B01D3/40 (EP,US); C07D301/32 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1992/46]
TitleGerman:Reinigung von Propylenoxid durch Flüssigextraktion[1992/46]
English:Purification of propylene oxide by liquid extraction[1992/46]
French:Purification de l'oxyde de propylène par extraction liquide[1992/46]
Examination procedure10.04.1993Examination requested  [1993/23]
09.07.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.04.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.1994Fee for grant paid
07.06.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.08.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]US3464897  (JUBIN JOHN C JR);
 [A]US3541114  (TAYLOR WALLACE E, et al);
 [AD]US3843488  (SCHMIDT J, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.