EP0512831 - Fibrinogen receptor antagonists [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2000 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | ||
Former [1992/46] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duggan, Mark E. 300 North Essex Avenue, Apt. 205B Narberth, PA 19072 / US | 02 /
Ihle, Nathan 2416 Rickert Road Perkasie, PA 18944 / US | 03 /
Hartman, George 1529 Tennis Circle Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | 04 /
Turchi, Laura M. 214 Croft Ridge Drive Broomal, PA 19008 / US | 05 /
Egbertson, Melissa S. 1232 Lois Road Ambler, PA 19002 / US | 06 /
Hoffman, William F. 740 Weikel Road Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | [1992/46] | Representative(s) | Thompson, John, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/46] | Thompson, John Dr., et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 92304113.1 | 07.05.1992 | [1992/46] | Priority number, date | US19910696893 | 07.05.1991 Original published format: US 696893 | US19910720357 | 25.06.1991 Original published format: US 720357 | US19920871262 | 23.04.1992 Original published format: US 871262 | [1992/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0512831 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0512831 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/06, C07D211/76, C07D417/06, C07D401/14, C07D453/06, A61K31/445, A61K31/495, A61K31/54 | [1992/46] | CPC: |
C07D401/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61P7/02 (EP);
C07D211/76 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D417/06 (EP,US);
C07D453/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1992/46] | Title | German: | Fibrinogen-Rezeptor-Antagonisten | [1992/46] | English: | Fibrinogen receptor antagonists | [1992/46] | French: | Antagonistes des récepteurs fibrinogeniques | [1992/46] | Examination procedure | 06.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/23] | 28.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.09.1999 | BE | 22.09.1999 | CH | 22.09.1999 | GR | 22.09.1999 | LI | 22.09.1999 | NL | 22.09.1999 | SE | 22.09.1999 | DK | 22.12.1999 | PT | 22.12.1999 | LU | 07.05.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
BE | 22.09.1999 | ||
CH | 22.09.1999 | ||
GR | 22.09.1999 | ||
LI | 22.09.1999 | ||
NL | 22.09.1999 | ||
SE | 22.09.1999 | ||
DK | 22.12.1999 | ||
PT | 22.12.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
BE | 22.09.1999 | ||
CH | 22.09.1999 | ||
LI | 22.09.1999 | ||
NL | 22.09.1999 | ||
SE | 22.09.1999 | ||
DK | 22.12.1999 | ||
PT | 22.12.1999 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
BE | 22.09.1999 | ||
CH | 22.09.1999 | ||
LI | 22.09.1999 | ||
NL | 22.09.1999 | ||
SE | 22.09.1999 | ||
PT | 22.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
BE | 22.09.1999 | ||
CH | 22.09.1999 | ||
LI | 22.09.1999 | ||
SE | 22.09.1999 | ||
PT | 22.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
BE | 22.09.1999 | ||
CH | 22.09.1999 | ||
LI | 22.09.1999 | ||
PT | 22.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
BE | 22.09.1999 | ||
PT | 22.12.1999 | ||
CH | 27.12.1999 | ||
LI | 27.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/26] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
BE | 22.09.1999 | ||
PT | 22.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
BE | 22.09.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0372486 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [Y] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [PY]US5064814 (KLEIN SCOTT I [US], et al) [PY] 1-26* the whole document *; | [PA]EP0478362 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [PA] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP0478328 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [PA] 1-26 * the whole document * |