Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0512840
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
05.06.1998 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.07.1998 [1998/30] |
13.06.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.07.1997 [1997/31] |
27.05.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.05.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.02.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.11.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
18.05.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.04.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.02.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.11.1994 |
First examination report |
|
27.04.1993 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.06.1993 [1993/24] |
05.01.1993 |
Publication of search report |
published on 24.02.1993 [1993/08] |
26.09.1992 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.11.1992 [1992/46] |