EP0514101 - Method for operating a computer system to resolve numerical planning problems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.1996 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.1996 [1996/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/47] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Etoh, Hiroaki 144-27-101 Kamisakunobe, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Maruyama, Keiichi 144-1 Nara-machi Ohmiya-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1992/47] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/41] | Burt, Roger James, Dr. IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1992/47] | Killgren, Neil Arthur IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 92304208.9 | 11.05.1992 | [1992/47] | Priority number, date | JP19910140710 | 17.05.1991 Original published format: JP 14071091 | [1992/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0514101 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0514101 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/20 | [1992/47] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06F40/18 (EP,US);
Y10S715/967 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bedienung eines Rechnersystems zur Lösung numerischer Planungsprobleme | [1992/47] | English: | Method for operating a computer system to resolve numerical planning problems | [1992/47] | French: | Procédé de résolution de problèmes numériques de planification à l'aide d'un système d'ordinateur | [1992/47] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 31.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/21] | 17.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/43] | 29.05.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1996 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPS61229164 [ ] (IBM); | [DA]EP0199909 (IBM [US]) [DA] 1,4,9,10 * column 6, line 12 - line 30 * * column 7, line 5 - line 48 *; | [X]US5016170 (POLLALIS SPIRO N [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9,10 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 43 * * column 6, line 32 - column 7, line 5 * * column 7, line 59 - column 8, line 10 * * column 9, line 54 - column 10, line 37 *; | [X] - M. KUDO ET AL, "InterBALANCE: Cooperative Load-Balancing System", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 7TH CONFERENCE ON ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE APPLICATIONS, MIAMI, US, (199102), pages 106 - 109, XP000298884 [X] 1-7,9,11 * page 106, column R, paragraph L * * page 107, column L, paragraph L - page 109, column R, paragraph 1 * | [A] - N. KANAI ET AL, "An Expert System to Assist Production Planning", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE FOR INDUSTRIAL APPLICATIONS (IEEE AI '88), HITACHI CITY, JP, (198805), pages 219 - 224, XP000093149 [A] 1-12 * page 220 - page 221 * * page 223 * | [A] - K. MORI ET AL, "Cooperative Scheduling Environment Based on Editing and Simulation for Manufacturing Systems", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1990 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYSTEMS, MAN AND CYBERNETICS, LOS ANGELES, US, (199011), pages 557 - 559, XP000215408 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |