EP0518484 - 1,4-Benzodiazepines condesed with 5- and 6-membered heterocyclic rings to treat anxiety, pain, pupil constriction, withdrawal-syndrome or oncologic disorders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.1994 [1994/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freidinger, Roger M. 744, Newport Lane Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | 02 /
Evans, Ben E. 501 Parkiomen Avenue Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | 03 /
Bock, Mark G. 1603 Leon Drive Hatfield, PA 19440 / US | [1992/51] | Representative(s) | Thompson, John, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | Thompson, John Dr., et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 92304263.4 | 12.05.1992 | [1992/51] | Priority number, date | US19910699868 | 14.05.1991 Original published format: US 699868 | [1992/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0518484 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0518484 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/55 | [1992/51] | CPC: |
A61K31/55 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/51] | Title | German: | Mit fünf- oder sechsgliedrigen heterozyklischen Ringverbindungen kondensierte 1,4-Benzodiazepine zur Behandlung von Angstzuständen, Schmerz, Pupillenkontraktion, Entzugserscheinungen oder onkologischen Erkrankungen | [1992/51] | English: | 1,4-Benzodiazepines condesed with 5- and 6-membered heterocyclic rings to treat anxiety, pain, pupil constriction, withdrawal-syndrome or oncologic disorders | [1992/51] | French: | 1,4-Benzodiazépines condensés avec des hétérocycles à 5 et 6 chaînons, pour traiter l'anxiété, la douleur, les troubles de la contraction prepillaire, les syndromes de désaccoutumance et les affections oncologiques | [1992/51] | File destroyed: | 31.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 18.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/21] | 22.12.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4847248 (FREIDINGER ROGER M [US], et al); | [Y]US4169150 (HARA TAKESHI, et al); | [Y]EP0411668 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]); | [Y]BE798677 (CENTRE ETD IND PHARMA); | [Y]US3875181 (DERIEG MICHAEL EDWARD, et al) | [Y] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 23, no. 8pages 952-955; R.G. SMITH et al.: "Synthesis and anxiolytic activity of a series of pyrazino(1,2-a)(1,4)benzodiazepine derivatives" |