EP0514205 - Process of producing cordierite honeycomb structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 08.05.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.1998 | Opposition rejected | published on 24.06.1998 [1998/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-Cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/47] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City Aichi Pref. / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Toshikazu, Joei-Haitsu 301 77, Ono-cho 1-chome Kasugai-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Kumazawa, Kazuhiko 34, Takemi-cho 1-chome, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Hamanaka, Toshiyuku 682-1, Minamiwakamatsu-cho Susuka-shi, Mie-ken / JP | 04 /
Kasai, Yoshiyuki 15 Takeda-cho 3-chome, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1992/47] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1992/47] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward MEWBURN ELLIS 2 Cursitor Street London EC4A 1BQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92304430.9 | 15.05.1992 | [1992/47] | Priority number, date | JP19910142577 | 17.05.1991 Original published format: JP 14257791 | [1992/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0514205 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0514205 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/18, C04B33/04, C04B38/00 | [1992/47] | CPC: |
C04B35/04 (EP);
C04B35/195 (EP);
C04B38/0006 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0006, C04B35/195 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Honigwabenstruktur aus Cordierit | [1992/47] | English: | Process of producing cordierite honeycomb structure | [1992/47] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'une structure cordiérite, en nid d'abeilles | [1992/47] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/47] | 10.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.09.1996
ADMISSIBLE Porzellanwerk Kloster Veilsdorf GmbH Fabrikstr. 1 98669 Veilsdorf / DE Opponent's representative Däsch, Götz Patentanwalt Engelplatz 11 07743 Jena / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.09.1996
ADMISSIBLE Porzellanwerk Kloster Veilsdorf GmbH Fabrikstr. 1 98669 Veilsdorf / DE Opponent's representative Däsch, Götz Patentanwalt Engelplatz 11 07743 Jena / DE | 12.12.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.04.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.06.1997 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 12.08.1997 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 29.01.1998 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 08.02.1998 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1998/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0332984 ; | [Y]FR2188492 ; | [A]EP0393565 ; | [A]FR2272965 ; | [A]EP0354721 ; | [A]EP0278749 | Examination | GB1509572 | GB1456456 |