EP0515202 - Horticultural implement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.1996 [1996/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Malcolm, Alexander Brian 139 High Street South Dunstable, Beds LU6 3SQ / GB | [1992/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/48] | Representative(s) | Raynor, Simon Mark, et al Murgitroyd & Company Milton Keynes Studio H1B 297 Upper Fourth Street Witan Studios Milton Keynes MK9 1EH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/19] | Raynor, Simon Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Midsummer House 411C Midsummer Boulevard Central Milton Keyes MK9 3BN Buckinghamshire / GB | ||
Former [1994/26] | Archer, Philip Bruce Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Midsummer House, 411C Midsummer Boulevard Central Milton Keynes, Bucks. MK9 3BN / GB | ||
Former [1992/48] | Gregory, Timothy Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Midsummer House 411C Midsummer Boulevard Central Milton Keynes MK9 3BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 92304648.6 | 21.05.1992 | [1992/48] | Priority number, date | GB19910010936 | 21.05.1991 Original published format: GB 9110936 | [1992/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0515202 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0515202 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A01B1/14 | [1992/48] | CPC: |
A01B1/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/48] | Title | German: | Gartengerät | [1992/48] | English: | Horticultural implement | [1992/48] | French: | Outil de jardinage | [1992/48] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/28] | 20.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1995 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   11.07.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1946197U ; | [A]US1177389 ; | [AD]GB384452 ; | [AD]GB356990 ; | [A]US2279747 ; | [AD]GB2060338 ; | [AD]GB907271 |