EP0571672 - Compositions for making inks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.1999 [1999/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEDAH LIMITED 20 Upper Merrion Street Dublin 2 / IE | [1993/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clewer, Harold Grenville 22 Aspin Park Crescent Knaresborough, Harrogate H95 8EZ / GB | [1993/48] | Representative(s) | Houghton, David, et al Hulse & Co St. James House 2nd Floor Vicar Lane Sheffield S1 2EX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/48] | Houghton, David, et al Hulse & Co. Eagle Star House, Carver Street Sheffield S1 4FP / GB | Application number, filing date | 92304714.6 | 26.05.1992 | [1993/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0571672 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/18 | [1993/48] | CPC: |
C09D11/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/48] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung zur Herstellung von Tinten | [1993/48] | English: | Compositions for making inks | [1993/48] | French: | Composition pour la production d'encres | [1993/48] | Examination procedure | 30.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/30] | 25.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10) | 07.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/11] | 15.10.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.1994 | 31.05.1998 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9117222 |