EP0516432 - Triple lock handcuff with cushion grip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.01.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1996 | Refusal of application | published on 24.01.1996 [1996/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corcoran, Dan Earl 8310 Southwest Greenway No. 45 Beaverton Oregon 97005 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | For all designated states Corcoran, Dan Earl 8310 Southwest Greenway No. 45 Beaverton Oregon 97005 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/49] | Representative(s) | Skerrett, John Norton Haigh, et al Wilson Gunn Skerrett, Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | Skerrett, John Norton Haigh, et al H.N. & W.S. Skerrett Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | Application number, filing date | 92304866.4 | 28.05.1992 | [1992/49] | Priority number, date | US19910708220 | 31.05.1991 Original published format: US 708220 | [1992/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0516432 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0516432 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E05B75/00 | [1992/49] | CPC: |
E05B75/00 (EP,US);
Y10T70/404 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/49] | Title | German: | Dreifache Schlosshandschelle mit Kissengriff | [1992/49] | English: | Triple lock handcuff with cushion grip | [1992/49] | French: | Menottes à triple blocage et coussinet de poignet | [1992/49] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 28.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/43] | 24.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1996/04] | 07.09.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US1775727 [ ] (LATOU WILLIAM L); | US2388766 [ ] (ALFRED RUTTIMAN); | US3618345 [ ] (SMITH HOLLIS B); | EP0185461 [ ] (CHUBB & SONS LOCK & SAFE CO); | US4314466 [ ] (HARRIS JAMES E) |