EP0516436 - Sputtering device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEPOSITION SCIENCES, INC. 386 Tesconi Court Santa Rosa California 95401 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | For all designated states DEPOSITION SCIENCES, INC. 386 Tesconi Court Santa Rosa California 95401 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartolomei, Leroy A. 540 Buena Vista Drive Santa Rosa, CA 95404 / US | 02 /
Read, Thomas 1435 Fulton Road Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US | 03 /
Shevlin, Craig 7400 Bridget Drive Rohnert Park, CA 94928 / US | [1992/49] | Representative(s) | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | ||
Former [1992/49] | Pendlebury, Anthony, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 92304870.6 | 28.05.1992 | [1992/49] | Priority number, date | US19910709035 | 31.05.1991 Original published format: US 709035 | [1992/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0516436 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0516436 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0516436 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/34, C23C14/34 | [1992/49] | CPC: |
C23C14/0623 (EP,US);
C23C14/0078 (EP);
C23C14/0641 (EP);
C23C14/0676 (EP);
C23C14/08 (EP);
C23C14/505 (EP);
C23C14/568 (EP);
C23C14/5806 (EP);
C23C14/5826 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/49] | Title | German: | Sputteranlage | [1992/49] | English: | Sputtering device | [1992/49] | French: | Dispositif de pulvérisation | [1992/49] | Examination procedure | 28.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/48] | 08.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.10.1997
02.12.1997
ADMISSIBLE Optical Coating Laboratory Inc. 2789 Northpoint Parkway Santa Rosa California 95407 / US Opponent's representative Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.10.1997
02.12.1997
ADMISSIBLE Optical Coating Laboratory Inc. 2789 Northpoint Parkway Santa Rosa California 95407 / US Opponent's representative Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [1997/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.10.1997
02.12.1997
ADMISSIBLE Optical Coating Laboratory Inc. 2789 Northpoint Parkway Santa Rosa California 95407 / US Opponent's representative Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | 09.12.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.06.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 09.11.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.12.2000 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.12.2000 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 10.12.2003 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2004/19] | Appeal following opposition | 21.02.2001 | Appeal received No. T0253/01 | 25.04.2001 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.03.2004 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | 15.03.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 10.12.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.12.2003 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 22.07.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 22.07.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.08.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 15.01.1997 | GR | 15.01.1997 | SE | 15.04.1997 | LU | 31.05.1997 | AT | 28.05.2002 | BE | 31.05.2002 | CH | 31.05.2002 | LI | 31.05.2002 | NL | 01.12.2002 | FR | 31.01.2003 | [2012/36] |
Former [2012/34] | ES | 15.01.1997 | |
GR | 15.01.1997 | ||
SE | 15.04.1997 | ||
LU | 31.05.1997 | ||
AT | 28.05.2002 | ||
BE | 31.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.05.2002 | ||
LI | 31.05.2002 | ||
NL | 01.12.2002 | ||
FR | 31.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | ES | 15.01.1997 | |
GR | 15.01.1997 | ||
SE | 15.04.1997 | ||
LU | 31.05.1997 | ||
AT | 28.05.2002 | ||
GB | 28.05.2002 | ||
BE | 31.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.05.2002 | ||
LI | 31.05.2002 | ||
NL | 01.12.2002 | ||
DE | 03.12.2002 | ||
FR | 31.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | ES | 15.01.1997 | |
GR | 15.01.1997 | ||
SE | 15.04.1997 | ||
LU | 31.05.1997 | ||
AT | 28.05.2002 | ||
GB | 28.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.05.2002 | ||
LI | 31.05.2002 | ||
NL | 01.12.2002 | ||
DE | 03.12.2002 | ||
FR | 31.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/45] | ES | 15.01.1997 | |
GR | 15.01.1997 | ||
SE | 15.04.1997 | ||
LU | 31.05.1997 | ||
AT | 28.05.2002 | ||
GB | 28.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.05.2002 | ||
LI | 31.05.2002 | ||
NL | 01.12.2002 | ||
DE | 03.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | ES | 15.01.1997 | |
GR | 15.01.1997 | ||
SE | 15.04.1997 | ||
LU | 31.05.1997 | ||
AT | 28.05.2002 | ||
GB | 28.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.05.2002 | ||
LI | 31.05.2002 | ||
NL | 01.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | ES | 15.01.1997 | |
GR | 15.01.1997 | ||
SE | 15.04.1997 | ||
LU | 31.05.1997 | ||
GB | 28.05.2002 | ||
NL | 01.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | ES | 15.01.1997 | |
GR | 15.01.1997 | ||
SE | 15.04.1997 | ||
LU | 31.05.1997 | ||
GB | 28.05.2002 | ||
Former [2002/25] | ES | 15.01.1997 | |
GR | 15.01.1997 | ||
SE | 15.04.1997 | ||
LU | 31.05.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | GR | 15.01.1997 | |
SE | 15.04.1997 | ||
LU | 31.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | SE | 15.04.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP5875839 ; | [A]JP60194073 ; | [Y]FR2218402 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [Y]US4026787 (KUEHNLE MANFRED R); | [A]EP0103461 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]); | [A]EP0173164 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]US4610770 (SAITO HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]WO9005793 (VAC TEC SYST [US]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 170 (E-189)27 July 1983 & JP-A-58 75 839 ( FUJITSU ) 7 May 1983, & JP5875839 A 19830507 | [A] - JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART A vol. 4, 1986, NEW YORK US pages 196 - 201 B. WINDOW ET AL. 'CHARGED PARTICLE FLUXES FROM PLANAR MAGNETRON SPUTERING SOURCES' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 49 (C-330)(2106) 26 February 1986 & JP-A-60 194 073 ( HITACHI ) 2 October 1985, & JP60194073 A 19851002 |