EP0517486 - Global user interface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1992/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pike, Robert Charles 18 Elizabeth Street Basking Ridge, New Jersey 07920 / US | [1992/50] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/50] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 92305050.4 | 02.06.1992 | [1992/50] | Priority number, date | US19910712212 | 07.06.1991 Original published format: US 712212 | [1992/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0517486 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0517486 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | [1997/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0517486 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033, G06F9/44 | [1997/18] | CPC: |
G06F8/38 (EP,US);
G06F3/0481 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/50] | G06F3/033 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/50] | Title | German: | Globale Benutzerschnittstelle | [1999/32] | English: | Global user interface | [1992/50] | French: | Interface d'utilisation globale | [1999/32] |
Former [1992/50] | Global Benutzerschnittstelle | ||
Former [1992/50] | Utilisateur global interface | Examination procedure | 23.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/52] | 23.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 15.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36] | Request for further processing for: | 25.01.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 26.01.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.02.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 13.09.2000 | IT | 13.09.2000 | [2008/02] |
Former [2002/25] | ES | 13.09.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0393837 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 ** page 3, line 49 - page 4, line 57 *; | [X] - STUBS M, "HANDBUCH IM COMPUTER MICROSOFTS HILFE-SYSTEM", CHIP ZEITSCHRIFT FUER MIKROCOMPUTER-TECHNIK, (19891201), no. 12, pages 179 - 182, XP000072588 [X] 1 * the whole document * |