EP0574630 - Windowing display system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1998 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/51] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Griffiths, Edward 6 Oakhurst Road, Highfield Southampton, Hampshire, S02 1TP / GB | [1993/51] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/51] | Burt, Roger James, Dr. IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 92305669.1 | 19.06.1992 | [1993/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0574630 | Date: | 22.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0574630 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/06, G09G5/14 | [1993/51] | CPC: |
G09G5/06 (EP,US);
G09G5/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/51] | Title | German: | Rechner-Anzeigesystem mit Fenstern | [1993/51] | English: | Windowing display system | [1993/51] | French: | Système d'affichage comportant des fenêtres | [1993/51] | Examination procedure | 29.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/26] | 30.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 19.03.1997 | DE | 20.06.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [1998/03] | DE | 20.06.1997 | |
FR | 14.08.1997 | ||
Former [1997/43] | DE | 20.06.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0210423 (IBM [US]); | [A]US5025249 (SEILER LARRY D [US], et al); | [A]EP0482746 (IBM [US]); | [A]WO9207349 (ELF AQUITAINE [FR]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN vol. 30, no. 12, May 1988, ARMONK, NY, USA pages 5 - 6 'Mapping multiple images to one custom color palette' |