blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0520772

EP0520772 - Cooling systems in tapping attachments suitable for high pressure application [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.06.2000
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.06.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.08.2000 [2000/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tapmatic Corporation
1851 Kettering Street Irvine
California 92714 / US
[N/P]
Former [1993/01]For all designated states
Tapmatic Corporation
1851 Kettering Street
Irvine California 92714 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Eriksson, Alf
Nackanasvagen 18
S-131 33 Nacka / SE
[1993/01]
Representative(s)Singleton, Jeffrey
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1993/01]Singleton, Jeffrey
Eric Potter Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate
Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB
Application number, filing date92305806.924.06.1992
[1993/01]
Priority number, dateUS1991072438428.06.1991         Original published format: US 724384
[1993/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0520772
Date:30.12.1992
Language:EN
[1992/53]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0520772
Date:30.06.1993
Language:EN
[1993/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0520772
Date:18.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.1993
ClassificationIPC:B23Q1/00, B23B31/08, B23G1/46
[1993/01]
CPC:
B23G1/465 (EP,US); B23Q1/0036 (EP,US); Y10T279/17111 (EP,US);
Y10T408/45 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1993/01]
TitleGerman:Kühlungsysteme in Gewindebohrgeräten, verwendbar mit Hochdruck[1993/01]
English:Cooling systems in tapping attachments suitable for high pressure application[1993/01]
French:Systèmes de refroidissement dans des appareils de taraudage à application haute pression[1993/01]
Examination procedure03.03.1994Examination requested  [1994/19]
15.05.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.11.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.12.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.1999Fee for grant paid
29.03.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.05.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
10.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
09.02.1994M01   Fee paid on   03.03.1994
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.199403   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.1994
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3902559  (BILZ OTTO WERKZEUG [DE]);
 [A]US1930035  (BOGART FRED H)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.