EP0520805 - Polycarbonate production method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.2000 [2000/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE PLASTICS JAPAN LIMITED 7-2, 3-Chome, Nihonbashi-Honcho Chuo-Ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states GE PLASTICS JAPAN LIMITED 7-2, 3-Chome, Nihonbashi-Honcho Chuo-Ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakashita, Takeshi 1-40 Ohgicho 3-chome Iwakuni City, Yamaguchi Prefecture / JP | 02 /
Shimoda, Tomoaki 2-3-303, Muronoki 1-chome Iwakuni City, Yamaguchi Prefecture / JP | [1999/35] |
Former [1993/01] | 01 /
Sakashita, Takeshita 1-40 Ohgicho 3-chome Iwakuni City, Yamaguchi Prefecture / JP | ||
02 /
Shimoda, Tomoaki 2-3-303, Muronoki 1-chome Iwakuni City, Yamaguchi Prefecture / JP | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al London Patent Operation, GE Technical Services Co. Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1994/32] | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1993/01] | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92305879.6 | 25.06.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | JP19910159144 | 28.06.1991 Original published format: JP 15914491 | [1993/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0520805 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/53] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0520805 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0520805 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08G64/30, C08K5/42 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
C08G64/307 (EP,US);
C08K5/42 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/42, C08L69/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polycarbonat | [1993/01] | English: | Polycarbonate production method | [1993/01] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de polycarbonate | [1993/01] | Examination procedure | 30.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/43] | 08.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP1272631 ; | [XP]EP0435124 (GE PLASTICS JAPAN LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0360578 (GE PLASTICS JAPAN LTD [JP]); | [A]US3489716 (CALKINS THORNTON R); | [A]DE3041298 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) | [A] - DATABASE WPIL Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 89-361759 (49) & JP-A-1 272 631 (DAICEL CHEM IND KK) 31 October 1989, & JP1272631 A 19891031 |