EP0520835 - Scheme for interlocking devices in a computer system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.02.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.1999 | Refusal of application | published on 31.03.1999 [1999/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 146 Main Street Maynard Massachusetts 01745 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 146 Main Street Maynard, Massachusetts 01745 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Quinlan, Una M. 112 Templevilla Drive Templeogue, Dublin / IE | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Maggs, Michael Norman, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | Maggs, Michael Norman, et al Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 92305981.0 | 29.06.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | US19910724402 | 28.06.1991 Original published format: US 724402 | [1993/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0520835 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/53] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0520835 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/14 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
G06F13/1652 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/01] | Title | German: | Verriegelungsschema für Geräte in einem Rechnersystem | [1993/01] | English: | Scheme for interlocking devices in a computer system | [1993/01] | French: | Schéma de verrouillage de dispositifs dans un système d'ordinateurs | [1993/01] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/01] | 15.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.11.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1999/13] | 14.11.1998 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1999/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4402046 (COX GEORGE W [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 3, line 1 - line 55 * * column 5, line 12 - column 7, line 34 * * figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0077008 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [A] 1-14 * page 6, line 30 - page 9, line 13 * * page 13, line 18 - page 16, line 2 * * figure 3A; claims 1-4 * |