EP0537879 - Aryl triflate compound, radiologically acid producing agent, radiologically acid producing agent system, and radiosensitive composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.1999 [1999/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-1-1, Nishishinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/16] | For all designated states HITACHI CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 2-1-1, Nishishinjuku Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaji, Makoto 3-6, Daiharacho-2-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | 02 /
Pappas, Peter S. 10 Rock Spring Road West Orange, NJ 07052 / US | [1993/16] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1993/16] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 92306026.3 | 30.06.1992 | [1993/16] | Priority number, date | US19910790169 | 18.10.1991 Original published format: US 790169 | [1993/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0537879 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0537879 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07C309/65, C07D209/48, G03F7/029 | [1993/16] | CPC: |
G03F7/0045 (EP,US);
C07C309/65 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [1993/16] | Title | German: | Aryltriflat-Verbindungen, ein unter Einfluss von Strahlung säureproduzierendes Mittel, ein unter Einfluss von Strahlung säureproduzierendes System und eine strahlungsempfindliche Zusammensetzung | [1998/18] | English: | Aryl triflate compound, radiologically acid producing agent, radiologically acid producing agent system, and radiosensitive composition | [1993/16] | French: | Composés aryl-triflates, agent producteur d'acide sous l'influence d'irradiation, système producteur d'acide sous l'influence d'irradiation, et composition radiosensitive | [1993/16] |
Former [1993/16] | Aryltriflat-Verbindungen, ein unter Einfluss von Strahlung säureproduzierendes Mittel, ein unter Einfluss von Strahlung säureproduzierendes System und eine Strahlungsempfindliche Zusammensetzung | Examination procedure | 28.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 01.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3346612 (HANSEN ROBERT L) | [X] - SYNTHESIS. no. 2, February 1982, STUTTGART DE pages 85 - 126 P.J. STANG ET AL. 'Perfluoroalkanesulfonic Esters: Methods of Preparation and Applications in Organic Chemistry' | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 115, no. 21, 25 November 1991, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 231872v, J.A. ROBL 'Preparation of highly substituted phenyls.' page 908 ;column 2 ; | [X] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS vol. 31, no. 24, 1990, OXFORD GB pages 3421 - 3424 J.A. ROBL 'A New and Versatile Route for the Synthesis of Highly Substituted Benzenoids' | [X] - JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 1 no. 7, July 1989, LETCHWORTH GB pages 1365 - 1366 M.R.I. CHAMBERS ET AL. 'Nickel Catalysed Conversion of Phenol Triflates into Aromatic Nitriles and Acids' | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 111, no. 25, 18 December 1989, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 232502d, D.E. RUDISILL ET AL. 'Palladium-catalyzed synthesis of 2-substituted indoles.' page 760 ;column 1 ; | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 108, no. 17, 25 April 1988, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 150229u, M.E. KROLSKI ET AL. 'Palladium-catalyzed coupling of 2-bromoanilines with vinylstannanes. A regiocontrolled synthesis of substituted indoles.' page 722 ;column 1 ; | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 111, no. 13, 25 September 1989, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 115161f, A.H. KATZ ET AL. 'Preparation of substitut ed-8-alkenyl-1,3,4,9-tetrahydropyrano-[3,4 b]indole-1-acetic acids as analgesics and antiinflammatories.' page 662 ;column 2 ; | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 109, no. 26, 26 December 1988, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 241505t, E. POETSCH ET AL. 'Preparation of alkylene- or ring-coupled liquid-crystal compounds.' page 725 ;column 1 ; | [X] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. vol. 109, no. 9, 29 April 1987, GASTON, PA US pages 2831 - 2833 K.S. PETRAKIS ET AL. 'Palladium-Catalyzed Substitutions of Triflates Derived from Tyrosine-Containing Peptides and Simpler Hydroxyarenes Forming 4-(Diethoxyphosphinyl)phenylalanines and Diethyl Arylphosphonates' | [X] - CHEMISTRY LETTERS no. 3, 1991, TOKYO JP pages 459 - 460 N. YONEDA ET AL. 'A Facile Preparation of Aryl Triflates. Decomposition of Arenediazonium Tetrafluoroborate Salts in Trifluoromethanesulfonic Acid' | [X] - EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY.CHIMICA THERAPEUTICA vol. 18, no. 2, 1983, PARIS FR pages 107 - 111 G. DECODTS ET AL. 'Suicide inhibitors of proteases. Lack of activity of halomethyl derivatives of some aromatic lactames' | [X] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS vol. 28, no. 13, 1987, OXFORD GB pages 1381 - 1384 G.A. PETERSON ET AL. 'Palladium Catalyzed Reduction of Aryl Triflates - Utilization in the Synthesis of Angelicin, Olivin and Chromomycinone from Phenols Produced in the Benzannulation Reaction of Chromium Carbene Complexes' | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 116, no. 14, 6 April 1992, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 129789g, V. PERCEC ET AL. 'Synthesis of functional poly(p-phenylene)s from substituted hydroquinones via nickel-catalyzed coupling of their bistriflates.' page 9 ;column 1 ; | [XP] - JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY. vol. 57, no. 5, 28 February 1992, EASTON US pages 1481 - 1486 W. CABRI ET AL. 'a-Regioselectivity in Palladium-Catalyzed Arylation of Acyclic Enol Ethers' | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 113, no. 16, 15 October 1990, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 142315g, N. HAYASHI ET AL. 'Radiation-sensitive resin compositions and method of pattern formation.' page 699 ;column 2 ; | [A] - MACROMOLECULES vol. 23, no. 1, 8 January 1990, EASTON US pages 145 - 150 T.X. NEENAN ET AL. 'Photo- and Thermochemistry of Select 2,6-Dinitrobenzyl Esters in Polymer Matrices: Studies Pertaining to Chemical Amplification and Imaging' |