EP0523882 - Crash protection device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES AUTOMOTIVE CLIFFORD LIMITED Spring Road Birmingham, B11 3DN / GB | [1993/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edge, Stanley John 174 Wake Green Road Moseley, Birmingham, B13 9QE / GB | [1993/03] | Representative(s) | Pearce, Anthony Richmond Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/03] | Pearce, Anthony Richmond MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 92306070.1 | 01.07.1992 | [1993/03] | Priority number, date | GB19910015187 | 13.07.1991 Original published format: GB 9115187 | [1993/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0523882 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0523882 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/20 | [1993/03] | CPC: |
B60R21/21658 (EP,US);
B60R21/217 (EP,US);
B60R2021/21543 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT [1993/03] | Title | German: | Aufprallschutzvorrichtung | [1993/03] | English: | Crash protection device | [1993/03] | French: | Dispositif de protection contre les accidents | [1993/03] | Examination procedure | 15.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/36] | 27.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 16.10.1996 | IT | 16.10.1996 | PT | 16.01.1997 | [2008/02] |
Former [2002/25] | ES | 16.10.1996 | |
IT | 16.10.1996 | ||
PT | 16.01.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 16.10.1996 | |
PT | 16.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/50] | PT | 16.01.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO9118769 (TAKATA CORP [JP]); | [X]US3888508 (KIZU RYOHEI, et al); | [Y]US5002306 (HIRAMITSU TETSUSHI [JP], et al); | [X]DE4027068 (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP]); | [X]GB2236082 (TAKATA CORP [JP]); | [A]US4934735 (EMBACH JAMES T [US]) |