EP0522796 - Method and apparatus for obtaining pure-absorption two-dimensional lineshape data for multidimensional NMR spectroscopy using switched acquisition time gradients [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.1997 [1997/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/02] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hurd, Ralph Eugene 1029 Nicklaus Avenue Milpitas, California 95035 / US | 02 /
Plant II, Harris Daniel 4705 Wallasy Road Salida, California 95368 / US | 03 /
John, Boban Kuriakose 3881 Cosmic Place Fremont, California 94538 / US | [1993/02] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1993/02] | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92306126.1 | 02.07.1992 | [1993/02] | Priority number, date | US19910727203 | 09.07.1991 Original published format: US 727203 | [1993/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0522796 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/46 | [1993/02] | CPC: |
G01R33/4633 (EP,US);
G01R33/4608 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1993/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Apparat zur Gewinnung von zweidimensionalen, reinen Absorptions-Linienform-Daten für die multidimensionale magnetische Kernresonanz-Spektroskopie mittels geschalteten Gradienten während der Datenerfassung | [1993/02] | English: | Method and apparatus for obtaining pure-absorption two-dimensional lineshape data for multidimensional NMR spectroscopy using switched acquisition time gradients | [1993/02] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour obtenir les données bidimensionnelles de forme de la raie d'absorption pure pour la spectroscopie RMN multidimensionelle utilisant des gradients commutés pendant le temps d'acquisition | [1993/02] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/35] | 25.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/10] | 08.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1996 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4766377 (OHUCHI MUNEKI [JP], et al); | [A]US3674998 (BENZ HANSPETER); | [AP]WO9201235 (SPECTROSPIN AG [CH], et al) | [X] - JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE. vol. 93, no. 1, 1 June 1991, ORLANDO, MN US pages 54 - 62 I.M. BRERETON ET AL. 'QUADRATURE DETECTION IN F1 INDUCED BY PULSED FIELD GRADIENTS' | [A] - JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE. vol. 75, no. 3, 1 December 1987, ORLANDO, MN US pages 467 - 473 P.B. BARKER ET AL. 'LINESHAPES IN PHASE-ENCODED SPECTROSCOPIC IMAGING EXPERIMENT' | [A] - JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE. vol. 78, no. 2, 15 June 1988, ORLANDO, MN US pages 355 - 361 C.H. SOTAK ETA L. 'THE UNEQUIVOCAL DETERMINATION OF IN VIVO LACTIC ACID USING TWO-DIMENSIONAL DOUBLE-QUANTUM COHERENCE-TRANSFER SPECTROSCOPY' | [AP] - JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE. vol. 94, no. 3, 1 October 1991, ORLANDO, MN US pages 637 - 644 A.L. DAVIS ET AL. 'ABSORPTION-MODE TWO-DIMENSIONAL NMR SPECTRA RECORDED USING PULSED FIELD GRADIENTS' |