EP0522868 - Use of the human endothelin receptor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/02] | A human endothelin receptor | ||
[2002/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIONOGI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA trading under the name of SHIONOGI & CO. LTD. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | For all designated states SHIONOGI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA trading under the name of SHIONOGI & CO. LTD. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | ||
Former [1993/02] | For all designated states SHIONOGI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA trading under the name of SHIONOGI & CO. LTD. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imura, Hiroo 59-2, Kitadaimaru-cho, Ichijoji Sakyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Nakao, Kazuwa 4-1-2, Kitakutsukake-cho, Oeda Nishigyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | 03 /
Nakanishi, Shigetada 517-116, Hase-cho, Iwakura Sakyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | [1993/02] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/02] | Nash, David Allan, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 92306347.3 | 10.07.1992 | [1993/02] | Priority number, date | JP19910172828 | 12.07.1991 Original published format: JP 17282891 | [1993/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0522868 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0522868 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP0522868 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/10, C12N15/12, C12N15/79, C12P21/02 | [2002/42] | CPC: |
C07K14/70571 (EP,US);
C07K14/72 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/02] | C07K15/00, C12N5/10, C12N15/12, C12N15/79, C12P21/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/02] | Title | German: | Verwendung des Rezeptors für Human-Endothelin | [2002/42] | English: | Use of the human endothelin receptor | [2002/42] | French: | Utilisation du récepteur de l'éndothéline humain | [2002/42] |
Former [1993/02] | Rezeptor für Human-Endothelin | ||
Former [1993/02] | A human endothelin receptor | ||
Former [1993/02] | Récepteur de l'éndothéline humain | Examination procedure | 06.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/35] | 26.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.09.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03014202.0 / EP1355156 | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38] | Request for further processing for: | 06.04.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 07.04.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.04.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 24.09.2003 | GR | 24.12.2003 | PT | 24.02.2004 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/33] | NL | 24.09.2003 | |
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | GR | 24.12.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0480381 (NIPPON CHEMIPHAR CO [JP]) | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 117, no. 1, July 06, 1992 Columbus, Ohio, USA AIJI SAKAMOTO et al. "Cloning and functional expression of human cDNA for ETB endothelin receptor." page 216(217), column 2(1), abstract-no. 2003m & Biochem. Biophys. Res. Commun. 1991, 178(2), 656-663 | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 116, no. 13, March 30, 1992 Columbus, Ohio, USA YOSHIHIRO OGAWA et al. "Molecular cloning of a non-isopeptide-selective human endothelin receptor." page 230, column 1, abstract-no. 122329y & Biochem. Biophys. Res. Commun. 1991, 178(1), 248-255 | [AP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 116, no. 13, March 30, 1992 Columbus, Ohio, USA MAKOTO NAKAMUTA et al. "Cloning and sequence analysis of a cDNA encoding human non-selective type of endothelin receptor." page 223, column 1, abstract-no. 122267b & Biochem. Biophys. Res. Commun. 1991, 177(1), 34-39 | [AP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 116, no. 9, March 02, 1992 Columbus, Ohio, USA HERBERT Y. LIN et al. "Cloning and functional ex- pression of a vascular smooth muscle endothelin 1 receptor." page 165, column 2, abstract-no. 77056u & Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA 1991, 88(8), 3185-3189 | Examination | - ARAI H ET AL., "Cloning and expression of a cDNA encoding an endothelin receptor", NATURE, (19901220), vol. 348, pages 730 - 732 | - PETER M. G. AND DAVENPORT A. P., "Characterization of the endothelin receptor selective agonist, BQ3020 and antagonists BQ123, FR139317, BQ788, 50235, Ro462005 and bosentan in the heart", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (1996), vol. 117, pages 445 - 462 | - SAKURAI T. ET AL., "Cloning of a cDNA encoding a non-isopeptide-selective subtype of the endothelin receptor", NATURE, (19901220), vol. 348, pages 732 - 735 |