EP0523975 - Windscreen wiper blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.1997 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRICO LIMITED Pontypool Gwent NP4 0XZ Wales / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | For all designated states TRICO LIMITED Pontypool Gwent NP4 0XZ, Wales / GB | ||
Former [1993/03] | For all designated states TRICO-FOLBERTH LIMITED Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9HP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mower, Peter 9, Blandford Avenue Whitton, Twickenham, Middlesex / GB | [1993/03] | Representative(s) | James, Michael John Gwynne, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James Morgan Arcade Chambers 33, St. Mary Street Cardiff Glamorgan CF1 2AB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | James, Michael John Gwynne, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James Morgan Arcade Chambers 33, St. Mary Street Cardiff Clamorgan CF1 2AB / GB | ||
Former [1993/03] | Pedder, James Cuthbert J.C. Pedder & Co. 38 Norbury Cross Norbury London SW16 4JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92306473.7 | 15.07.1992 | [1993/03] | Priority number, date | GB19910015611 | 19.07.1991 Original published format: GB 9115611 | [1993/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0523975 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0523975 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/38 | [1993/03] | CPC: |
B60S1/38 (EP);
B60S2001/3836 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, IT [1993/03] | Title | German: | Scheibenwischerblatt | [1993/03] | English: | Windscreen wiper blade | [1993/03] | French: | Balai d'essuie-glaces | [1993/03] | Examination procedure | 19.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/37] | 16.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/52] | Request for further processing for: | 03.04.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 05.04.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.07.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 02.01.1997 | [2008/02] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 02.01.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4658463 (SUGITA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [X]DE2640841 (ANDERSON CO); | [A]DE1655984 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]EP0012251 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |