EP0529793 - Process for the preparation of mono-olefins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.1997 [1997/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The British Petroleum Company p.l.c. Britannic House, 1 Finsbury Circus London EC2M 7BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states THE BRITISH PETROLEUM COMPANY P.L.C. Britannic House, 1 Finsbury Circus London EC2M 7BA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Astbury, Christoper John, The British Petroleum Company p.l.c., Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | 02 /
Griffiths, David Charles, The British Petroleum Company p.l.c., Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | 03 /
Howard, Mark Julian, BP Chemicals Limited Salt End Hedon, Hull HU12 8DS / GB | 04 /
Reid, Ian Allan Beattie, The British Petroleum Company plc, Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | [1993/09] | Representative(s) | Wilson, Michael John, et al BP International Limited, Patents & Agreements Division, Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Wilson, Michael John, et al BP International Limited, Patents & Agreements Division, Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 92306594.0 | 17.07.1992 | [1993/09] | Priority number, date | GB19910017216 | 09.08.1991 Original published format: GB 9117216 | [1993/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0529793 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0529793 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0529793 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C10G11/22, C07C5/48 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
C07C5/48 (EP,US);
C10G11/22 (KR);
C10G2400/20 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C5/48, C07C11/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/09] | C10G11/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, SE [1993/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Mono-Olefinen | [1993/09] | English: | Process for the preparation of mono-olefins | [1993/09] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de mono-oléfines | [1993/09] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/41] | 08.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1113102 ; | [Y]US2817690 (LOBO WALTER E); | [A]FR1250763 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO); | [A]DE1156193 (HERCULES POWDER CO LTD); | [Y]EP0332289 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC [GB]) |