EP0527568 - Process for bonding substrates using Polyisocyanate adhesives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/07] | Polyisocyanate adhesive and sealant systems | ||
[1996/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.1997 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.1997 [1997/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1993/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gillis, Herbert Russell Unit 4, 8230 Crestview Drive Sterling Heights, Michigan 48077 / US | 02 /
Robertson, John Russell 59 Paul Lane Glenn Mills, Pennsylvania 19342 / US | [1993/07] | Representative(s) | Dolton, Peter Irving Ernest, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. P.O. Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire AL7 1HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | Dolton, Peter Irving Ernest, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. P.O. Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire AL7 1HD / GB | ||
Former [1993/07] | Dolton, Peter Irving Ernest Ici Group Patents Services Dept., P.O. Box. 6, Shire Park, Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City, Hertfordshire AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 92306786.2 | 24.07.1992 | [1993/07] | Priority number, date | GB19910017068 | 08.08.1991 Original published format: GB 9117068 | [1993/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0527568 | Date: | 17.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0527568 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0527568 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/38, C08G18/76, C09J175/00, C09K3/10, C08G18/10, C08G18/32 | [1993/13] | CPC: |
C09J175/00 (EP,KR,US);
C09J5/00 (KR);
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
C08G18/8038 (EP,US);
C08G18/8041 (EP,US);
C08L97/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/3256 (EP,US);
C08L97/02, C08L75/04 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1993/07] | C08G18/38, C08G18/76, C09J175/00, C09K3/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/07] | Title | German: | Klebverfahren unter Verwendung von Polyisocyanat-Klebstoffen | [1996/37] | English: | Process for bonding substrates using Polyisocyanate adhesives | [1996/37] | French: | Procédé de lamination avec adhésives du polyisocyanates | [1996/37] |
Former [1993/07] | Polyisocyanat Klebstoff- und Verschlusssysteme | ||
Former [1993/07] | Polyisocyanate adhesive and sealant systems | ||
Former [1993/07] | Systèmes d'adhésif et de scellement de polyisocyanate | Examination procedure | 24.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/34] | 22.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 11.12.1996 | [1997/18] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3607996 (BASF AG [DE]); | [X]DE2651479 (SCHERING AG); | [X]EP0375318 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]); | [XP]EP0469751 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]); | [A]FR1461924 (MARLES KUHLMANN WYANDOTTE); | [A]US4507443 (BARRON LARRY R [US], et al) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 105, no. 10, September 1986, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 79921u, OKUNO ET AL 'MOISTURE-CURABLE POLYURETHANE COMPOSITIONS' page 41 ;column 1 ; | Examination | JP6131418 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 105, no. 10, September 1986, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 79921u, OKUNO ET AL 'MOISTURE-CURABLE POLYURETHANE COMPOSITIONS' page 41 ;column 1 ; & JP-A-6131418, & JP6131418 A 00000000 |