EP0526177 - Apparatus for draining high pressure fluid samples [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.1996 [1996/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALLIBURTON COMPANY P.O. Drawer 1431 Duncan Oklahoma 73536 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | For all designated states HALLIBURTON COMPANY P.O. Drawer 1431 Duncan Oklahoma 73536 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schultz, Roger L. 1221 Nantucket Drive Richardson, Texas 75080 / US | 02 /
Ringgenberg, Paul D. 2101 Brentwood Lane Carrollton, Texas 75006 / US | [1993/05] | Representative(s) | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92306907.4 | 29.07.1992 | [1993/05] | Priority number, date | US19910737751 | 30.07.1991 Original published format: US 737751 | [1993/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0526177 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0526177 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E21B49/08 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
E21B49/08 (EP,US);
E21B49/081 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/05] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Trennen von unter hohem Druck stehenden Flüssigkeitsproben | [1993/05] | English: | Apparatus for draining high pressure fluid samples | [1993/05] | French: | Dispositif pour séparer des échantillons de liquides sous haute pression | [1993/05] | Examination procedure | 08.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/19] | 07.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4583595 (CZERNICHOW JEAN A [FR], et al); | [A]US4782695 (GLOTIN BERNARD J P [FR], et al); | [A]US4811599 (JOHNSON RICHARD L, et al) |