EP0530975 - Data processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.1997 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.12.1997 [1997/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATRA MARCONI SPACE UK LIMITED The Grove Warren Lane Stanmore Middlesex HA7 4LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/07] | For all designated states MATRA MARCONI SPACE UK LIMITED The Grove Warren Lane Stanmore Middlesex HA7 4LY / GB | ||
Former [1993/10] | For all designated states BRITISH AEROSPACE SPACE AND COMMUNICATIONS LIMITED Gunnelswood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tichborne, Franklin George, c/o British Aerospace Space Systems Limited, FPC 321, P.O. Box 5 Filton, Bristol BS12 7QW / GB | 02 /
Stevens, John Sidney, c/o British Aerospace Space Systems Limited, FPC 321, P.O. Box 5 Filton, Bristol BS12 7QW / GB | [1993/10] | Representative(s) | Newell, William Joseph, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/10] | Newell, William Joseph, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92307076.7 | 03.08.1992 | [1993/10] | Priority number, date | GB19910017187 | 08.08.1991 Original published format: GB 9117187 | [1993/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0530975 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0530975 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/00, G05B19/04, B64G1/24 | [1994/18] | CPC: |
G05B19/0423 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/10] | G06F9/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/10] | Title | German: | Datenverarbeitungsvorrichtung | [1993/10] | English: | Data processing apparatus | [1993/10] | French: | Dispositif de traitement de données | [1993/10] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/01] | 27.10.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1997 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3763472 (SHARP R); | [A]US3975712 (HEPWORTH EDWARD C, et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]GB2097564 (BRITISH AEROSPACE) [A] 1-6 * page 1, line 43 - page 2, line 34 * * page 3, line 35 - line 39 * |