EP0530979 - Protection latch for mortise cylindrical lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.09.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 25.10.1995 [1995/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Friedman, Jacob 3 Hatarucha Street Tel-Aviv / IL | [1993/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/10] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/10] | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 92307102.1 | 04.08.1992 | [1993/10] | Priority number, date | IL19610000993 | 01.09.1991 Original published format: IL 99361 | IL19750001017 | 04.05.1992 Original published format: IL 101775 | [1993/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0530979 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E05B17/20 | [1993/10] | CPC: |
E05B17/2092 (EP);
E05B17/0062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1993/10] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsabdeckung für Einsteckzylinderschloss | [1993/10] | English: | Protection latch for mortise cylindrical lock | [1993/10] | French: | Verrou de sécurité pour serrure cylindrique | [1993/10] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 21.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/42] | 18.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/43] | 08.06.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.09.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.09.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE8914390U |