EP0527635 - Process for the catalytic hydrotreatment of petroleum feeds for the selective removal of sulfur and nitrogen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.08.1995 [1995/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/07] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Daage, Michel 534 Heritage Oak Drive Yardley, Pennsylvania 19067 / US | 02 /
Chianelli, Russell Robert 151 Station Road Branchburg, New Jersey 08876 / US | [1993/07] | Representative(s) | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 12 Esso House, Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/07] | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 72 Esso House Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92307324.1 | 11.08.1992 | [1993/07] | Priority number, date | US19910743957 | 12.08.1991 Original published format: US 743957 | [1993/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0527635 | Date: | 17.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0527635 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C10G45/02, C10G45/72, B01J35/02, C10G45/04 | [1993/14] | CPC: |
C10G45/72 (EP,US);
C10G45/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/07] | C10G45/02, C10G45/72 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur katalytischen Wasserstoffbehandlung von Erdöleinsatze zur selektiven Entfernung von Schwefel und Stickstoff | [1993/07] | English: | Process for the catalytic hydrotreatment of petroleum feeds for the selective removal of sulfur and nitrogen | [1993/07] | French: | Procédé pour l'hydrotraitement catalytique de charges pétrolières pour l'élimination sélective de soufre et d'azote | [1993/07] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 24.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 16.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1446175 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO); | [A]GB1471588 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO); | [A]DE3539195 (CHEVRON RES [US]) |