EP0528643 - Windscreen wiper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.1996 [1996/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANGLO AMERICAN INDUSTRIAL CORPORATION LIMITED 44 Main Street Johannesburg Transvaal / ZA | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | For all designated states ANGLO AMERICAN INDUSTRIAL CORPORATION LIMITED 44 Main Street Johannesburg, Transvaal / ZA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Swanepoel, Adriaan Retief 309 Aries Street, Waterkloof Ridge Pretoria, Transvaal / ZA | [1993/08] | Representative(s) | Godwin, Edgar James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | Godwin, Edgar James MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 92307416.5 | 13.08.1992 | [1993/08] | Priority number, date | ZA19910006473 | 16.08.1991 Original published format: ZA 916473 | ZA19920000354 | 17.01.1992 Original published format: ZA 920354 | [1993/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0528643 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0528643 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/38 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
B60S1/38 (EP,KR,US);
B60S1/3875 (EP,US);
B60S2001/382 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/08] | Title | German: | Scheibenwischer | [1993/08] | English: | Windscreen wiper | [1993/08] | French: | Essuie-glace | [1993/08] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/28] | 13.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1012902 (WALTER DANIEL APPEL); | [A]US3480986 (FORSTER LLOYD M); | [A]US4343063 (BATT RICHARD A); | [A]FR2515121 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |