EP0529906 - CRD endcap tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.1994 [1994/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jamrus, Kenneth John 427 Avenida Palmas San Jose, California 95123 / US | [1993/09] | Representative(s) | Lupton, Frederick, et al LONDON PATENT OPERATION G.E. TECHNICAL SERVICES Co. INC. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Lupton, Frederick, et al LONDON PATENT OPERATION, G.E. TECHNICAL SERVICES Co. INC., Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92307521.2 | 18.08.1992 | [1993/09] | Priority number, date | US19910749349 | 23.08.1991 Original published format: US 749349 | [1993/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0529906 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G21C19/02, G21C13/067 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
G21C19/02 (EP,US);
G21C13/067 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US);
Y10T29/531 (EP,US);
Y10T29/538 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53891 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/09] | Title | German: | Montagewerkzeug für Regelstabantriebsendkappe | [1993/09] | English: | CRD endcap tool | [1993/09] | French: | Engin de manutention de la partie terminale d'un mécanisme de barre | [1993/09] | File destroyed: | 24.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 04.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/18] | 03.12.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2353769 (DIAMOND POWER SPECIALITY [US]); | [A]FR1555740 ; | [A]LU77866 ; | [A]US3921440 (TOTH ENDRE LESLIE) |