EP0531013 - Electrostatic developing composition and process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/10] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jugle, Don B. 4 Holley Brook Drive Penfield, New York 14526 / US | 02 /
Lundy, Douglas A. 887 DeWitt Road Webster, New York 14580 / US | 03 /
Grande, Michael L. 2786 Route 21 Palmyra, New York 14522 / US | 04 /
Zimmer, Charles D. 6726 Fischer Road Ontario, New York 14519 / US | 05 /
Gutman, Edward J. 570 Whiting Drive Webster, New York 14580 / US | [1993/10] | Representative(s) | Pike, Christopher Gerard, et al Rank Xerox Ltd., Patent Department, Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | Pike, Christopher Gerard, et al Rank Xerox Ltd., Patent Department, Parkway Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1993/10] | Johnson, Reginald George, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 92307544.4 | 18.08.1992 | [1993/10] | Priority number, date | US19910755915 | 06.09.1991 Original published format: US 755915 | [1993/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0531013 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0531013 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/113 | [1993/10] | CPC: |
G03G9/1133 (EP,US);
G03G9/097 (EP,US);
G03G9/1131 (EP,US);
G03G9/1138 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/10] | Title | German: | Elektrostatische Entwicklerzusammensetzungen, und Verfahren | [1993/10] | English: | Electrostatic developing composition and process | [1993/10] | French: | Compositions de développement électrostatiques et procédé | [1993/10] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/42] | 13.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/19] | Request for further processing for: | 04.11.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 06.11.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.11.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP63284565 ; | [AD]US4078929 (GUNDLACH ROBERT W); | [Y]US4324851 (LU CHIN H, et al); | [A]US4771314 (PARKER DELMER G [US], et al); | [A]US4837101 (GRUBER ROBERT J [US], et al); | [YD]US4920023 (KOCH RONALD J [US], et al) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 104 (P-842)(3452) 13 March 1989 & JP-A-63 284 565 ( KONICA ) 21 November 1988, & JP63284565 A 19881121 | [Y] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE vol. 140, 1 December 1975, pages 6 - 8 T.A.JADWIN 'Electrographic toner and developer composition' |