EP0528682 - Process for manufacturing a filter and apparatus for carrying out the process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/08] | Filter and a device for manufaturing the same | ||
[1997/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.11.1998 [1998/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/20] | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1993/08] | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mito, Masayuki, c/o Mitsui Petrochem. Co., Ltd 1-2, Waki 6-chome, Waki-cho Kuga-gun. Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 02 /
Yuasa, Haruo, c/o Mitsui Petrochem. Co., Ltd 1-2, Waki 6-chome, Waki-cho Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 03 /
Iidera, Masayoshi 2563-2 Oaza Mita Shiraki-cho, Asakita-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | [1993/08] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 92307565.9 | 19.08.1992 | [1993/08] | Priority number, date | JP19910207896 | 20.08.1991 Original published format: JP 20789691 | [1993/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0528682 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0528682 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/52, B01D29/00, B29C53/28, B31D5/04 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
B01D39/00 (KR);
B01D46/0001 (EP,US);
B01D46/0032 (EP,US);
B01D46/10 (EP,US);
B01D46/52 (EP,US);
B01D46/521 (EP,US);
B01D46/523 (EP,US);
B29C53/285 (EP,US);
B29C65/18 (EP,US);
B29C66/43 (EP,US);
B29C66/438 (EP,US);
B29C66/83513 (EP,US);
B31D5/0082 (EP,US);
B01D2273/18 (EP,US);
B01D2275/10 (EP,US);
B29C53/36 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29L2016/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Filters und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1997/48] | English: | Process for manufacturing a filter and apparatus for carrying out the process | [1997/48] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un filtre et dispositif effectuer ladite fabrication | [1997/48] |
Former [1993/08] | Filter und Vorrichtung zu seiner Herstellung | ||
Former [1993/08] | Filter and a device for manufaturing the same | ||
Former [1993/08] | Filtre et appareil pour le fabricer | Examination procedure | 18.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/20] | 23.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0398459 (LIPPOLD HANS JOACHIM [DE]); | [A]CH213471 (PERSSON ERIC SIGFRID [SE]); | [A]DE2304882 (A W SCHIRP KG); | [A]US3870495 (DIXSON BRUCE E, et al); | [A]US3679057 (PEREZ DAMASCO RODOLFO ADELTO); | [A]DE3723757 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) |