EP0529982 - Exhaust apparatus for epitaxial growth system. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.1996 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.1996 [1996/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakano, Tomoiku, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1993/09] | Representative(s) | Moir, Michael Christopher Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Moir, Michael Christopher Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 92307682.2 | 21.08.1992 | [1993/09] | Priority number, date | JP19910066644 | 22.08.1991 Original published format: JP 6664491 | [1993/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0529982 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0529982 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C30B25/14, C23C16/44 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
C30B25/14 (EP,US);
C23C16/4412 (EP,US);
Y10S55/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/09] | Title | German: | Abgasvorrichtung für Epitaxie-Anlage | [1993/09] | English: | Exhaust apparatus for epitaxial growth system. | [1993/09] | French: | Appareillage pour les gaz d'échappement sortant d'une installation d'épitaxie | [1993/09] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 01.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP58182817 ; | [X]JP6013071 ; | [A]JP1139125 ; | [A]JP63297296 ; | [A]JP63224214 ; | [Y]CH663549 (ANTOINE DUBAS); | [Y]EP0196170 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [Y]EP0068738 (ITT [US], et al); | [Y]US4608063 (KUROKAWA TAKASHI [JP]) | [X] - SOLID STATE TECHNOLOGY vol. 29, no. 9, September 1986, WASHINGTON US pages 143 - 149 SARKOZY ET AL 'Semiconductor vacuum processing:protection of the mechanical pumping system' | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 21 (E-224)(1458) 28 January 1984 & JP-A-58 182 817 ( HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K. ) 25 October 1983, & JP58182817 A 19831025 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 125 (C-283)(1848) 30 May 1985 & JP-A-60 13 071 ( CANON K.K. ) 23 January 1985, & JP6013071 A 19850123 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 21 (E-224)21 April 1982 & JP-A-58 182 817 ( HITACHI SEISAKUSHO ) 25 October 1983, & JP58182817 A 19831025 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 394 (C-631)(3742) 31 August 1989 & JP-A-11 39 125 ( TOSHIBA CORP. ), & JP1139125 A 19890831 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 134 (C-581)(3482) 4 April 1989 & JP-A-63 297 296 ( FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. ) 5 December 1988, & JP63297296 A 19881205 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 18 (E-704)17 January 1989 & JP-A-63 224 214 ( HITACHI LTD ) 19 September 1988, & JP63224214 A 19880919 |