EP0531111 - Cosmetic composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.1995 [1995/52] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1993/10] | For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wiechers, Johann Wilhelm, Unilever Research Colworth Laboratory, Colworth House Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | 02 /
Lowry, Michael Richard, Unilever Research Port Sunlight Laboratory, Quarry Road East Bebington, Wirral, Merseyside L63 4JW / GB | 03 /
Wollers, John, Unilever Research Port Sunlight Laboratory, Quarry Road East Bebington, Wirral, Merseyside L63 4JW / GB | 04 /
Pratley, Stuart Keith, Unilever Research Port Sunlight Laboratory, Quarry Road East Bebington, Wirral, Merseyside L63 4JW / GB | [1993/10] | Representative(s) | Evans, Jacqueline Gail Victoria, et al Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | Evans, Jacqueline Gail Victoria, et al Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1993/10] | Tonge, Robert James UNILEVER PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92307962.8 | 02.09.1992 | [1993/10] | Priority number, date | GB19910018979 | 04.09.1991 Original published format: GB 9118979 | [1993/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0531111 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/06 | [1993/10] | CPC: |
A61K8/60 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q5/00 (EP,US);
A61Q7/00 (EP,US);
A61K2800/782 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1993/10] | Title | German: | Kosmetische Zusammensetzung | [1993/10] | English: | Cosmetic composition | [1993/10] | French: | Composition cosmétique | [1993/10] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 09.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/40] | 14.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/52] | 28.07.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1995/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2438534 (KOEHLER VALENTIN DR MED); | [A]EP0348184 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al); | [AD]EP0375388 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) |