EP0531135 - Water-paint treatment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.1995 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.1995 [1995/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BETZ EUROPE, INC. Somerton Road Trevose, PA 19053-6783 / US | [1993/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Purnell, Deborah Lillian 4000 Presidential Blvd. Philadelphia, PA 19131 / US | [1993/10] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/10] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 92308009.7 | 03.09.1992 | [1993/10] | Priority number, date | US19910754783 | 04.09.1991 Original published format: US 754783 | [1993/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0531135 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C09D7/00 | [1993/10] | CPC: |
C02F1/5236 (EP,US);
C02F1/54 (EP,US);
C09D7/71 (EP,US);
Y10S210/93 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/10] | Title | German: | Behandlung von wässrigen Farben | [1993/10] | English: | Water-paint treatment | [1993/10] | French: | Traitement pour des peintures aqueuses | [1993/10] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 07.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/40] | 17.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/17] | 29.11.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4863615 (STENGER CLAUDIA V [US], et al); | [XP]EP0475594 (BETZ EUROP INC [US]); | [A]US4440647 (PUCHALSKI WALTER J [US]) |