EP0534656 - Papermaking process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.1996 [1996/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NALCO CHEMICAL COMPANY One Nalco Center Naperville, IL 60563-1198 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | For all designated states NALCO CHEMICAL COMPANY One Nalco Center Naperville Illinois 60563-1198 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, James H. 8701 NE 54th Street,Apt B15 Vancouver, WA 98662 / US | [1993/14] |
Former [1993/13] | 01 /
Smith, James H. 2S670 Rt 59, Apt.E4. Warrenville, Illinois 60555 / US | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 92308334.9 | 14.09.1992 | [1993/13] | Priority number, date | US19910766310 | 27.09.1991 Original published format: US 766310 | [1993/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0534656 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0534656 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | D21H23/14 | [1993/13] | CPC: |
D21H23/14 (EP,US);
D21H17/63 (KR);
D21H17/66 (EP,US);
D21H17/67 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Papierherstellung | [1993/13] | English: | Papermaking process | [1993/13] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de papier | [1993/13] | Examination procedure | 12.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/28] | 10.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0235893 (ALLIED COLLOIDS LTD [GB]); | [AP]US5098520 (BEGALA ARTHUR J [US]); | [AP]US5126014 (CHUNG DANIEL K [CA]); | [AD]EP0335575 |